Bursa Announcements
Date : 22 September 2006
Change in Boardroom
MALAYSIA SMELTING CORPORATION BERHAD |
Date of change | 18/09/2006 |
Type of change | Resignation |
Designation | Non-Executive Director |
Directorate | Non Independent & Non Executive |
Name | YBhg. Dato' Ismail bin Shahudin |
Age | 55 |
Nationality | Malaysian |
Qualifications | Bachelor of Economics (Hons) from University of Malaya majoring in Business Administration |
Working experience and occupation | Dato' Ismail Shahudin began his career in 1974 in Esso Malaysia Berhad, attached to its Finance division. He then moved on to Citibank Malaysia as an Accounts Manager in 1984 and was later sent to Citibank New York as part of the team for Asia Pacific Division. Upon his return to Malaysia, he assumed the post of Vice President & Group Head of Public Sector and Financial Institutions in Citibank Malaysia. In 1992, he joined Maybank as its General Manager for Corporate Banking Division, rising to the rank of Executive Director in 1997. He left Maybank in August 2002 and assumed the position of Group Chief Executive of MMC Corporation Berhad until he relinquished the position on 31 March 2006. He is currently the Chairman of Bank Muamalat Malaysia Berhad. |
Directorship of public companies (if any) | Tronoh Mines malaysia Berhad, IJM Corporation Berhad |
Family relationship with any director and/or major shareholder of the listed issuer | Dato' Ismail Shahudin was a nominee director of MMC Corporation Berhad. MMC ceased to be a substantial shareholder of the Company as at 18/09/06. |
Details of any interest in the securities of the listed issuer or its subsidiaries | Nil |
Announcement Info
Company Name | MALAYSIA SMELTING CORPORATION BERHAD |
Stock Name | MSC |
Date Announced | 22 Sept 2006 |
Category | Change in Boardroom |
Reference No | MS-060921-67425 |